Name in Home Country / Full Name: |
Karl Fredrik Ljungberg |
---|---|
Date of birth/Age: | Apr 16, 1977 (47) |
Place of Birth: | Vittsjö |
Citizenship: | Sweden |
Avg. term as coach: |
0.72 Years |
Coaching Licence: | UEFA A Licence |
Agent: | CAA Base Ltd |
Website: |
Freddie Ljungberg
imago images
- Date of birth/Age: Apr 16, 1977 (47)
- Place of birth: Vittsjö
- Citizenship: Sweden
- Coaching Licence : UEFA A Licence
- Avg. term as coach : 0.72 Years
Former player:
Last club :
Mumbai City
Most games for :
Arsenal
Retired :
Jan 1, 2015
Personal Details
Stats
No information available.
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arsenal Caretaker Manager | 19/20 (Nov 29, 2019) | 19/20 (Dec 21, 2019) | 6 | 1.00 | ||
Arsenal Assistant Manager | 19/20 (Jul 1, 2019) | 20/21 (Aug 22, 2020) | - | 0.00 | ||
Assistant Manager of: Mikel Arteta (28 Games), Unai Emery (20 Games) | ||||||
Arsenal U23 Manager | 18/19 (Jul 1, 2018) | 18/19 (Jun 30, 2019) | 26 | 1.65 | ||
VfL Wolfsburg Assistant Manager | 16/17 (Feb 27, 2017) | 17/18 (Sep 18, 2017) | - | 0.00 | ||
Assistant Manager of: Andries Jonker (19 Games) | ||||||
Arsenal Youth Manager | 15/16 (Jan 18, 2016) | 16/17 (Feb 26, 2017) | - | 0.00 | ||
Arsenal Club representative | 12/13 (Jun 3, 2013) | 15/16 (Jan 17, 2016) | - | 0.00 |
Transfer history as a player
This page displays all transfers for the selected player. Alongside the date of the transfer, the clubs involved and the transfer fee, it also displays the market value of the player at the time of the transfer.
Season | Date | Left | Joined | MV | Fee | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
14/15 | Jan 1, 2015 | Mumbai City | Retired | - | - | |||||
14/15 | Sep 2, 2014 | Career break | Mumbai City | - | - | |||||
11/12 | Feb 14, 2012 | Shimizu S-Pulse | Career break | €500k | - | |||||
11/12 | Aug 27, 2011 | Celtic | Shimizu S-Pulse | €900k | free transfer | |||||
10/11 | Jan 1, 2011 | Chicago | Celtic | €2.00m | free transfer | |||||
10/11 | Jul 1, 2010 | Seattle | Chicago | €2.00m | ? | |||||
08/09 | Oct 1, 2008 | Without Club | Seattle | €3.50m | - | |||||
08/09 | Aug 1, 2008 | West Ham | Without Club | €5.00m | - | |||||
07/08 | Jul 1, 2007 | Arsenal | West Ham | €8.30m | €4.50m | |||||
98/99 | Sep 1, 1998 | Halmstads BK | Arsenal | - | €4.50m | |||||
93/94 | Jan 1, 1994 | Halmstad U19 | Halmstads BK | - | - | |||||
91/92 | Jul 1, 1991 | Halmstad U17 | Halmstad U19 | - | - | |||||
Total transfer fees: | €9.00m |